MT SB39 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise laws related to sexual offender evaluations and treatment
Title
Generally revise laws related to sexual offender evaluations and treatment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-05-12 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2021-05-04 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-04 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-04-29 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-04-26 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-04-23 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2021-04-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2021-04-22 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2021-04-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2021-04-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-13 | House | (H) Conference Committee Report Received (S) Conference |
2021-04-13 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Report Received (S) Conference |
2021-04-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Conference |
2021-04-12 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Conference |
2021-03-23 | House | (H) Conference Committee Appointed (S) Conference |
2021-03-22 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Appointed (S) Conference |
2021-03-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred |
2021-03-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-16 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2021-03-16 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-03-15 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-15 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-11 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-03-11 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2021-03-10 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2021-02-08 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2021-02-03 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Judiciary |
2021-01-29 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-01-29 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2021-01-27 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-01-27 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-01-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-01-25 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2021-01-25 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2021-01-25 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-01-25 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-01-25 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2021-01-25 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-01-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2021-01-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2021-01-18 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-01-08 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2021-01-06 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-01-05 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-01-04 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2020-12-23 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2020-12-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2020-12-15 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2020-12-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2020-12-05 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2020-12-04 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2020-12-04 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2020-12-04 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2020-11-24 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-11-24 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2020-11-08 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-11-04 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-09-16 | (C) Draft Request Received |