MT SB386 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws relating to real estate transaction
Title
Revise laws relating to real estate transaction
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Noland [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Failed (Y: 23 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2023-03-02 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Failed |
2023-03-02 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-03-02 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-03-02 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-03-01 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2023-03-01 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2023-02-28 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2023-02-17 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-02-17 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2023-02-16 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-16 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-02-16 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-02-08 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-08 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-02-08 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-08 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-02-08 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-02-08 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-08 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-02-08 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-02-06 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-02-03 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-01-31 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-01-27 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-10-19 | (C) Draft Request Received |