MT SB38 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify authority of dept. of transportation to install memorial signs
Title
Clarify authority of dept. of transportation to install memorial signs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed (Y: 23 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-01-22 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed (Y: 23 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-01-22 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2015-01-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2015-01-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed |
2015-01-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-01-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Highways and Transportation |
2015-01-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Highways and Transportation |
2015-01-13 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-01-13 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation |
2015-01-07 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-01-06 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-01-05 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-01-05 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2014-12-12 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2014-12-10 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2014-12-04 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-04 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2014-12-04 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2014-12-04 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2014-12-04 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2014-12-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-12-03 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-12-01 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-01 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-12-01 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2014-12-01 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-11-21 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-08-29 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2014-07-21 | (C) Draft Request Received |