MT SB370 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Finance and Claims
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Finance and Claims
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for enhanced driver's license
Title
Provide for enhanced driver's license
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-04-10 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-04-07 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-03-30 | Senate | (S) Taken from 2nd Reading; Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-03-30 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Highways and Transportation |
2017-03-30 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-03-28 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Highways and Transportation |
2017-03-28 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation |
2017-03-24 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2017-03-23 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-03-23 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-03-23 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2017-03-23 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-01-04 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-01-04 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-01-03 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-01-03 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-01-03 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-03 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-03 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-01-03 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2017-01-02 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-01-02 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-12-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-11-14 | (C) Draft Request Received |