MT SB370 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws related to corporate political contributions and expenditures
Title
Revise laws related to corporate political contributions and expenditures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2015-02-23 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) State Administration |
2015-02-23 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2015-02-19 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-18 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2015-02-18 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-01-07 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-01-07 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-01-07 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-01-05 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-01-02 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2015-01-02 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-12-29 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-12-29 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2014-12-18 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-12-18 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-12-17 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-17 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-12-16 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2014-12-15 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-12-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=370&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20151 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/sb0399/SB0370_1.pdf |