MT SB353 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional referendum to divert coal trust and create Build Montana program
Title
Constitutional referendum to divert coal trust and create Build Montana program
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Ripley [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2015-04-24 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Rejected |
2015-04-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Report Received (S) Free Conference |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Report Received |
2015-04-22 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Free Conference |
2015-04-21 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-21 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Appointed (S) Free Conference |
2015-04-21 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Dissolved (S) Conference |
2015-04-18 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred |
2015-04-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-15 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2015-04-14 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-14 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-13 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-13 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-09 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-09 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Natural Resources |
2015-04-08 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Natural Resources |
2015-04-01 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2015-03-24 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Natural Resources |
2015-03-05 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources |
2015-02-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources |
2015-02-23 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2015-02-23 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-23 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-21 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-02-17 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-17 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2015-02-17 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-17 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-02-17 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-02-14 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-02-12 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-02-11 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-11 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-02-07 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2015-02-06 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-02-02 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-02-02 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2014-07-28 | (C) Draft Request Received |