MT SB352 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify objections to water rights
Title
Clarify objections to water rights
Sponsors
Sen. John Esp [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2021-03-29 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2021-03-24 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2021-03-08 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-03-08 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2021-03-02 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-02-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Natural Resources |
2021-02-26 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Natural Resources |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2021-02-24 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-02-23 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2021-02-23 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-02-22 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-02-20 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-02-19 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-19 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-02-19 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-02-19 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-02-17 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-02-16 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-11-14 | (C) Draft Request Received |