MT SB338 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise election laws related to candidate filing fees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise election laws related to candidate filing fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-13 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-09 Chapter Number Assigned
2023-05-08Senate(S) Signed by Governor
2023-05-01Senate(S) Transmitted to Governor
2023-04-29House(H) Signed by Speaker
2023-04-20Senate(S) Signed by President
2023-04-18 (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available
2023-04-18Senate(S) Returned from Enrolling
2023-04-14Senate(S) Sent to Enrolling
2023-04-14House(H) Returned to Senate
2023-04-13House(H) 3rd Reading Concurred
2023-04-13House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2023-04-12House(H) 2nd Reading Concurred
2023-04-12House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2023-03-31House(H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) State Administration
2023-03-31House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) State Administration
2023-03-24House(H) Hearing (H) State Administration
2023-03-15House(H) First Reading
2023-03-15House(H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration
2023-03-01Senate(S) Transmitted to House
2023-02-28Senate(S) 3rd Reading Passed
2023-02-28Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2023-02-27Senate(S) 2nd Reading Passed
2023-02-27Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2023-02-23Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) State Administration
2023-02-22Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) State Administration
2023-02-22Senate(S) Hearing (S) State Administration
2023-02-15Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration
2023-02-14Senate(S) First Reading
2023-02-14 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2023-02-14Senate(S) Introduced
2023-02-13 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2023-02-09 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2023-02-09 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2023-02-09 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2023-02-09 (C) Draft in Assembly
2023-02-09 (C) Executive Director Review
2023-02-07 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2023-02-07 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2023-02-07 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2023-02-07 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review
2023-02-05 (C) Draft in Edit
2023-02-04 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2023-02-04 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2023-02-04 (C) Draft Taken Off Hold
2022-12-12 (C) Draft On Hold
2022-12-03 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=338&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20231
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2023/SB0399/SB0338_1.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2023/SB0399/SB0338_X.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2023/minutes/senate/votesheets/SB0338STS230222.pdf
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S765&P_SESS=20231
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S821&P_SESS=20231
Roll Callhttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2023/minutes/house/votesheets/SB0338STH230331.pdf
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1999&P_SESS=20231
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H2131&P_SESS=20231

Bill Comments

feedback