MT SB329 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - (S) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - (S) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allow for extension of state coal leases
Title
Allow for extension of state coal leases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | (S) Vetoed by Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-26 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-24 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-04-17 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-04-17 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-16 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-04-16 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2019-04-16 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-13 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2019-04-12 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2019-04-12 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2019-04-12 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-12 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Natural Resources |
2019-04-10 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Natural Resources |
2019-04-08 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2019-03-30 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Natural Resources |
2019-03-29 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2019-03-28 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-03-27 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2019-03-27 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2019-03-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-03-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-03-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Natural Resources |
2019-03-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Natural Resources |
2019-03-20 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2019-03-20 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-03-14 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2019-03-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-03-13 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-03-13 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2019-03-12 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-02-12 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2019-02-09 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-02-08 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-28 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-28 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2018-12-21 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-11-06 | (C) Draft Request Received |