MT SB324 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise the subdivision laws related to lease or rent requirements
Title
Generally revise the subdivision laws related to lease or rent requirements
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2013-04-12 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2013-05-01 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2013-04-26 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-25 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-15 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-15 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-12 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-12 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House |
2013-04-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred |
2013-04-11 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-05 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2013-04-04 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-04 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-03 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-03 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-03-27 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Local Government |
2013-03-26 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Local Government |
2013-03-21 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Local Government |
2013-03-07 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-03-07 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Local Government |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-26 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2013-02-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2013-02-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Local Government |
2013-02-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Local Government |
2013-02-22 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-02-22 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-02-22 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-02-20 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Local Government |
2013-02-19 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-02-15 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government |
2013-02-15 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-02-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-02-13 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-02-13 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-02-12 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-02-12 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-02-12 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-02-12 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2013-02-11 | (C) Draft Taken by Drafter | |
2013-02-08 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-08 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-02-08 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2013-02-07 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-02-07 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2013-02-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-02-03 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2013-02-03 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-10-17 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-09-25 | (C) Draft Request Received |