MT SB303 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise rural fire district laws
Title
Revise rural fire district laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2015-02-18 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Local Government |
2015-02-16 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Local Government |
2015-02-16 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-16 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-16 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-02-11 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government |
2015-02-11 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-10 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-10 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-02-10 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-02-10 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-02-09 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-02-09 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2015-02-09 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-09 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-02-07 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2015-02-07 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-02-07 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2015-02-07 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2015-02-05 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-02-03 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-13 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=303&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20151 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/sb0399/SB0303_1.pdf |