MT SB28 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Provide funding for conservation districts
Title
Provide funding for conservation districts
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Lang [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 62 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee |
2023-04-13 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2023-04-06 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2023-04-05 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2023-04-05 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-05 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-03-29 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2023-03-28 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2023-03-24 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2023-03-14 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-03-13 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2023-03-03 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2023-03-03 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-03-02 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2023-03-02 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-03-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-03-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-02-27 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2023-02-27 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2023-02-27 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-02-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-02-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-02-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-02-23 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-02-13 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-02-07 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-01-02 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2022-12-28 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2022-12-12 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2022-12-12 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2022-12-12 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2022-12-12 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2022-12-05 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2022-12-05 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2022-12-05 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2022-11-30 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2022-11-29 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2022-11-28 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2022-11-28 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2022-11-28 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2022-11-26 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2022-11-23 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2022-11-22 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2022-10-07 | (C) Draft Request Received |