MT SB278 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Finance and Claims
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Finance and Claims
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise cost-recovery and transfer laws for certain energy resources
Title
Revise cost-recovery and transfer laws for certain energy resources
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-03-13 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-02-26 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-02-25 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-02-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2019-02-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2019-02-21 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2019-02-19 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2019-02-18 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-18 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-02-18 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2019-02-18 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-02-18 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-02-18 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-02-18 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-02-18 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-02-16 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-16 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-02-16 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-02-16 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2019-02-16 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-02-16 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-02-16 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-12-07 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-11-06 | (C) Draft Request Received |