MT SB271 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) State Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) State Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow judicial candidates to announce endorsements
Title
Allow judicial candidates to announce endorsements
Sponsors
Sen. Carl Glimm [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - (H) Motion Failed (Y: 43 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-03-01 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) State Administration |
2021-04-09 | House | (H) Motion Failed |
2021-03-18 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) State Administration |
2021-03-16 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2021-03-08 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) State Administration |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2021-02-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2021-02-25 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2021-02-17 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2021-02-17 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-17 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-17 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-02-16 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-02-16 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-16 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-02-16 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-15 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-02-15 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-02-15 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-15 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-02-15 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-02-14 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-02-12 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-02-12 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-02-06 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-01-04 | (C) Draft Request Received |