MT SB257 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-08 - (S) Vetoed by Governor  
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-08 - (S) Vetoed by Governor  
Summary
Revise definition of renewable energy resource
Title
Revise definition of renewable energy resource
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Keane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-08 | (S) Vetoed by Governor   | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Transmitted to Governor   | |
2009-04-30 | (H) Signed by Speaker   | |
2009-04-28 | (S) Signed by President   | |
2009-04-16 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Sent to Enrolling   | |
2009-04-15 | (H) Returned to Senate   | |
2009-04-15 | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred   | |
2009-04-15 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-04-14 | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred   | |
2009-04-14 | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed   | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-03-27 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications | |
2009-03-27 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications | |
2009-03-13 | (H) Hearing (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications | |
2009-02-24 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications | |
2009-02-24 | (H) First Reading   | |
2009-02-24 | (S) Transmitted to House   | |
2009-02-24 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed   | |
2009-02-24 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-02-23 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed   | |
2009-02-23 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-02-18 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-02-18 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Energy and Telecommunications | |
2009-02-18 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Energy and Telecommunications | |
2009-01-29 | (S) Fiscal Note Printed   | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Fiscal Note Signed   | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Fiscal Note Received   | |
2009-01-27 | (S) Hearing (S) Energy and Telecommunications | |
2009-01-21 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-01-21 | (S) First Reading (S) Energy and Telecommunications | |
2009-01-21 | (S) Fiscal Note Requested   | |
2009-01-21 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications | |
2009-01-21 | (S) Introduced   | |
2009-01-19 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester   | |
2009-01-19 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft Back for Redo   | |
2009-01-15 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2009-01-14 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2009-01-14 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]   | |
2009-01-14 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2009-01-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2009-01-13 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2009-01-07 | (C) Draft Back for Redo   | |
2009-01-07 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery   | |
2009-01-05 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2009-01-05 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2009-01-05 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-01-05 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2009-01-02 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]   | |
2009-01-02 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2009-01-02 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2009-01-02 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2008-10-17 | (C) Draft On Hold   | |
2008-09-25 | (C) Draft Request Received   |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws09/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=257&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find |