MT SB25 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - (S) Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise duties of Education Interim Committee regarding MUS

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise duties of Education Interim Committee regarding MUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23Senate(S) Signed by Governor
2021-02-17Senate(S) Transmitted to Governor
2021-02-16House(H) Signed by Speaker
2021-02-16Senate(S) Signed by President
2021-02-15 (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available
2021-02-15Senate(S) Returned from Enrolling
2021-02-10Senate(S) Sent to Enrolling
2021-02-09House(H) Returned to Senate
2021-02-09House(H) 3rd Reading Concurred
2021-02-09House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2021-02-08House(H) 2nd Reading Concurred
2021-02-08House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-02-04House(H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Education
2021-02-03House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Education
2021-02-03House(H) Hearing (H) Education
2021-01-19House(H) First Reading
2021-01-19House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Education
2021-01-15Senate(S) Transmitted to House
2021-01-15Senate(S) 3rd Reading Passed
2021-01-15Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2021-01-14Senate(S) 2nd Reading Passed
2021-01-14Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-01-12Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Education and Cultural Resources
2021-01-11Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Education and Cultural Resources
2021-01-08Senate(S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources
2021-01-04Senate(S) First Reading
2020-12-23Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources
2020-12-11Senate(S) Introduced
2020-12-11 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2020-12-02 (C) Draft in Assembly
2020-12-02 (C) Executive Director Review
2020-11-30 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2020-11-30 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2020-11-19 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2020-11-17 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2020-10-26 (C) Draft in Edit
2020-08-13 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=25&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20211
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/SB0099/SB0025_1.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/SB0099/SB0025_X.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/minutes/senate/votesheets/SB0025EDS210111.pdf
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S0022&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S0031&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/minutes/house/votesheets/SB0025EDH210203.pdf
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H337&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H361&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S22&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S31&P_SESS=20211

Bill Comments

feedback