MT SB245 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise municipal zoning to allow multifamily and mixed use development
Title
Revise municipal zoning to allow multifamily and mixed use development
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concur Motion Failed (Y: 22 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-13 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - (H) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-15 - Senate - (S) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-01 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concur Motion Failed (Y: 22 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-13 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - (H) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-15 - Senate - (S) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2023-05-17 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2023-05-11 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2023-05-11 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2023-05-10 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2023-05-08 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2023-05-08 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2023-05-05 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-05-02 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2023-05-02 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2023-05-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-05-01 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2023-05-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-05-01 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2023-05-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2023-05-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-04-28 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Report Received Free Conference Committee on SB 245 |
2023-04-28 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Report Received Free Conference Committee on SB 245 |
2023-04-28 | Senate | (S) Hearing Free Conference Committee on SB 245 |
2023-04-27 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Appointed |
2023-04-25 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Appointed |
2023-04-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concur Motion Failed |
2023-04-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-04-14 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2023-04-13 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-12 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-05 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-04-05 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Local Government |
2023-04-04 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Local Government |
2023-03-23 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Local Government |
2023-03-14 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-03-13 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Local Government |
2023-02-27 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2023-02-24 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2023-02-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-02-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2023-02-17 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-02-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Local Government |
2023-02-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Local Government |
2023-02-15 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-02-08 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Local Government |
2023-02-02 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-01 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-02-01 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government |
2023-02-01 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-01-31 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-01-31 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-30 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-01-30 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-30 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-01-30 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-01-29 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-29 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-01-29 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-01-28 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-01-27 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-01-25 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-01-18 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-10-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |