MT SB242 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws related to providing alcohol to minors
Title
Revise laws related to providing alcohol to minors
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Webb [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-14 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary |
2015-03-13 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Judiciary |
2015-03-12 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2015-02-17 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-17 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2015-02-14 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-02-14 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-14 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-13 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-13 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-11 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-02-11 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2015-02-11 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2015-02-10 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2015-01-30 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2015-01-30 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-01-29 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-29 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-01-29 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-01-27 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-01-27 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-01-27 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-01-27 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-27 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-01-26 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2015-01-26 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-01-26 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-13 | (C) Draft Request Received |