MT SB228 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise public employee union laws
Title
Generally revise public employee union laws
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Hertz [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass as Amended Motion Failed (Y: 25 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass as Amended Motion Failed (Y: 25 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2021-03-02 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Pass as Amended Motion Failed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-02-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) State Administration |
2021-02-26 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) State Administration |
2021-02-25 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-11 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-11 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-02-10 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-02-05 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-02-05 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-02-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-11-20 | (C) Draft Request Received |