MT SB225 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require DEQ refund fees for subdivision review extensions
Title
Require DEQ refund fees for subdivision review extensions
Sponsors
Sen. Carl Glimm [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - (S) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - (S) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2023-02-23 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-02-13 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-02-09 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-02-09 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-02-09 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-02-07 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Local Government |
2023-02-06 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Local Government |
2023-02-02 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-02-01 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Local Government |
2023-02-01 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2023-02-01 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-01-27 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-01-27 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government |
2023-01-26 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-26 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-01-26 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-01-26 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2023-01-26 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-01-25 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-25 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-01-25 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-24 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-01-24 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-24 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-01-24 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-01-24 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-01-24 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-01-23 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-23 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-01-23 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-01-23 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-01-18 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-01-17 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-01-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-01-07 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-12-23 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2022-11-10 | (C) Draft Request Received |