MT SB211 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require holding period for certain property tax exemptions
Title
Require holding period for certain property tax exemptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Taxation |
2019-04-01 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2019-02-15 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Taxation |
2019-02-14 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2019-02-14 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-02-06 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2019-02-06 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-02-05 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-05 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-02-05 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2019-02-05 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-02-04 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-02-02 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2019-02-02 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-02-01 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-25 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-12-19 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-12-19 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2018-12-18 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-11-15 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=211&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20191 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/SB0299/SB0211_1.pdf |