MT SB205 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the Hire Montana First Act
Title
Provide for the Hire Montana First Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2015-02-10 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2015-02-06 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2015-02-02 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-01-30 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-01-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2015-01-23 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-01-22 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-22 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-01-22 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-01-21 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-01-07 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-01-07 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2015-01-07 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-01-07 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-01-06 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-06 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-01-06 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2015-01-05 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-12-29 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-11-04 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Contracts
Labor and Employment
Local Government
Public Contracts
Revenue, State
Rule Making
State Government
Labor and Employment
Local Government
Public Contracts
Revenue, State
Rule Making
State Government
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=205&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20151 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/sb0299/SB0205_1.pdf |