MT SB203 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Finance and Claims
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Finance and Claims
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Add a District Court Judge to the 18th Judicial District
Title
Add a District Court Judge to the 18th Judicial District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-03-13 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-02-21 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-02-15 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-02-15 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2019-02-15 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-02-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2019-02-14 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-02-04 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2019-02-02 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-02-01 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-01 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-02-01 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2019-01-31 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-01-29 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-01-29 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-28 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-01-28 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-01-28 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-28 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-28 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-01-26 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2019-01-26 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-25 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-12-28 | (C) Draft Request Received |