MT SB190 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain canceled dealership contract repurchase requirements
Title
Revise certain canceled dealership contract repurchase requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Sonju [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-02-28 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2013-02-14 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-02-08 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-01-24 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2013-01-24 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-01-24 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-23 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-01-22 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-01-09 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-01-08 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-01-08 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-01-08 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-08 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-01-08 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2013-01-07 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-01-07 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2012-12-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-12-14 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2012-11-29 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-11-20 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=190&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20131 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2013/sb0199/SB0190_1.pdf |