MT SB185 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize transfer of game to licensed outfitter for inspection purposes
Title
Authorize transfer of game to licensed outfitter for inspection purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - (S) Fish and Game Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - (S) Fish and Game Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - (S) Fish and Game Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - (S) Fish and Game Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2017-04-11 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2017-04-06 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2017-03-28 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-03-28 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2017-03-25 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2017-03-25 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-03-25 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-24 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-03-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-22 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-03-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Fish and Game |
2017-03-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Fish and Game |
2017-03-13 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Fish and Game |
2017-03-13 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-10 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-03-10 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Fish and Game |
2017-03-09 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Fish and Game |
2017-02-09 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Fish and Game |
2017-02-01 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-02-01 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Fish and Game |
2017-02-01 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-02-01 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2017-01-30 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-01-27 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-01-27 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-01-27 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-01-27 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-01-26 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-26 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-26 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-01-26 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2017-01-25 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-01-24 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-01-23 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-01-05 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2016-12-22 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2016-10-25 | (C) Draft Request Received |