MT SB184 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - (S) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - (S) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise workers compensation to allow termination of payments due to fraud
Title
Revise workers compensation to allow termination of payments due to fraud
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | (S) Vetoed by Governor |
2017-04-25 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-24 | House | (H) Returned to Senate Not Concurred in Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2017-04-24 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Not Adopted |
2017-04-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-18 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2017-04-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Not Adopted |
2017-04-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-14 | Senate | (S) Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-06 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-05 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-05 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-04 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-03 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2017-04-01 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-01 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-31 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-03-31 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-17 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-03-17 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2017-03-16 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Business and Labor |
2017-03-14 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Business and Labor |
2017-03-10 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2017-02-27 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Business and Labor |
2017-02-23 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-02-23 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2017-02-21 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2017-02-21 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-02-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-02-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-02-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-02-10 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-02-01 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-02-01 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-01-31 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-31 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2017-01-26 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-01-26 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-01-25 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-01-24 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-24 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-23 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-01-19 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2017-01-19 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-01-16 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-01-16 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-16 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-01-13 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2016-12-29 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2016-12-29 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2016-12-28 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-12-28 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-12-28 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-28 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-12-27 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-12-27 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2016-12-26 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-12-26 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-12-23 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-12-01 | (C) Draft Request Received |