MT SB182 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise laws on state finance, reducing tax rate if conditions met
Title
Generally revise laws on state finance, reducing tax rate if conditions met
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Hertz [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 66 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Appropriations |
2021-04-15 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2021-04-12 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2021-04-09 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2021-04-09 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-09 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-06 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2021-04-01 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2021-03-10 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2021-03-10 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-03-09 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2021-03-02 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-02-26 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-02-26 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-22 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-02-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2021-02-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2021-02-18 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-02-11 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-02-11 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-02-11 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2021-02-05 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-05 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2021-02-05 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-05 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-02-05 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-02-04 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-02-04 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-04 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-02-04 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-02-04 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-02-04 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-04 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-02-04 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-02-04 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-02-04 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-02-03 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-10-29 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2020-10-26 | (C) Draft Request Received |