MT SB18 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Establish workforce housing tax credits
Title
Establish workforce housing tax credits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed (Y: 23 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - Senate - (S) Rereferred to Committee (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed (Y: 23 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - Senate - (S) Rereferred to Committee (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2019-04-01 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2019-03-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | Senate | (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-03-22 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-03-20 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-03-13 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-03-13 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-03-13 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-15 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-02-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2019-02-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2019-02-13 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2019-01-30 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-01-23 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2019-01-10 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-01-09 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2019-01-08 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-01-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-01-02 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Taxation |
2018-12-21 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2018-12-05 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2018-12-03 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-03 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2018-11-23 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-11-20 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-11-20 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-11-20 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-11-20 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-11-02 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2018-11-01 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2018-11-01 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-10-18 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-10-18 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-10-18 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2018-07-31 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Housing
Insurance
Revenue, State
Rule Making
Taxation (Generally)
Taxation--Corporations
Taxation--Individual Income
Insurance
Revenue, State
Rule Making
Taxation (Generally)
Taxation--Corporations
Taxation--Individual Income