MT SB164 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Revise non-degradation standard for nitrates

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise non-degradation standard for nitrates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred (Y: 48 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-19 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29House(H) Died in Process
2021-04-14House(H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred
2021-04-14House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-04-09House(H) 2nd Reading Pass Consideration
2021-04-09House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-03-25House(H) Motion Failed
2021-03-25 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2021-03-24House(H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Natural Resources
2021-03-19House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Natural Resources
2021-03-17House(H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources
2021-03-08House(H) First Reading
2021-03-02House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources
2021-03-02Senate(S) Transmitted to House
2021-03-02Senate(S) 3rd Reading Passed
2021-03-01Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2021-03-01Senate(S) 2nd Reading Passed
2021-03-01Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-02-27 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2021-02-27Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Natural Resources
2021-02-26Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Natural Resources
2021-02-26Senate(S) Taken from Table in Committee (S) Natural Resources
2021-02-24 (C) Amendments Available
2021-02-12Senate(S) Tabled in Committee (S) Natural Resources
2021-02-03Senate(S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources
2021-01-28Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources
2021-01-28Senate(S) First Reading
2021-01-27 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2021-01-27Senate(S) Introduced
2021-01-26 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2021-01-25 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2021-01-25 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2021-01-25 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2021-01-25 (C) Draft in Assembly
2021-01-25 (C) Executive Director Review
2021-01-22 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2021-01-22 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2021-01-22 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2021-01-22 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2021-01-19 (C) Draft in Edit
2021-01-19 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2021-01-14 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2020-12-13 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback