MT SB16 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow minors to consent to emergency shelter and services
Title
Allow minors to consent to emergency shelter and services
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Gross [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Human Services |
2021-04-13 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Human Services |
2021-04-12 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2021-03-24 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Human Services |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2021-02-27 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-02-27 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-02-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (S) Judiciary |
2021-01-19 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Judiciary |
2021-01-14 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-01-12 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2021-01-04 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2020-12-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2020-12-11 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2020-12-11 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2020-12-01 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2020-11-30 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2020-11-30 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2020-11-30 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2020-11-29 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-11-27 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2020-11-27 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2020-11-23 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-11-21 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2020-11-05 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-10-21 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-08-25 | (C) Draft Request Received |