MT SB16 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise appointment process laws for commissioner of political practices
Title
Revise appointment process laws for commissioner of political practices
Sponsors
Sen. Dee Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-11 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-02-27 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2015-02-17 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-02-17 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-16 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-02-14 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-02-14 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-02-13 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-02-12 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2015-02-11 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-02-11 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-10 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-02-10 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-09 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-06 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) State Administration |
2015-02-06 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) State Administration |
2015-02-05 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2015-01-27 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2015-01-24 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-01-24 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-01-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-01-22 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-01-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2015-01-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2015-01-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-01-15 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-01-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) State Administration |
2015-01-14 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) State Administration |
2015-01-09 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2015-01-05 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2014-12-12 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2014-11-20 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2014-11-20 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2014-11-17 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2014-10-26 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-10-23 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-10-21 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2014-10-21 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-10-20 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2014-10-15 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-10-15 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2014-10-15 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-10-15 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-08-20 | (C) Draft Request Received |