MT SB16 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee  
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee  
Summary
Include warm water fishing stamp as part of all fishing licenses
Title
Include warm water fishing stamp as part of all fishing licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | (S) Died in Standing Committee   | |
2009-03-31 | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal   | |
2009-01-29 | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Fish and Game | |
2009-01-22 | (S) Hearing (S) Fish and Game | |
2009-01-06 | (S) Fiscal Note Printed   | |
2009-01-06 | (S) Fiscal Note Signed   | |
2009-01-05 | (S) First Reading   | |
2008-12-30 | (S) Fiscal Note Received   | |
2008-12-04 | (S) Fiscal Note Requested   | |
2008-12-03 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Fish and Game | |
2008-11-14 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically   | |
2008-11-14 | (S) Introduced   | |
2008-11-07 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent   | |
2008-10-14 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2008-10-14 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2008-10-14 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically   | |
2008-10-14 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2008-10-10 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]   | |
2008-10-10 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2008-10-10 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2008-10-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2008-09-12 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable   | |
2008-09-12 | (C) Draft Request Received   |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws09/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=16&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find |