MT SB159 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Personal Income Tax Relief Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal Income Tax Relief Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09House(H) Tabled in Committee (H) Taxation
2021-03-16Senate(S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed
2021-03-16Senate(S) Revised Fiscal Note Received
2021-03-12Senate(S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested
2021-03-11 (C) Amendments Available
2021-03-10House(H) Hearing (H) Taxation
2021-03-01House(H) First Reading
2021-03-01House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation
2021-02-27Senate(S) Transmitted to House
2021-02-27Senate(S) 3rd Reading Passed
2021-02-27Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2021-02-26Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims
2021-02-26Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims
2021-02-25Senate(S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims
2021-02-23Senate(S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims
2021-02-23Senate(S) 2nd Reading Passed
2021-02-23Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-02-19Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Taxation
2021-02-19Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Taxation
2021-02-11Senate(S) Hearing (S) Taxation
2021-02-04Senate(S) Fiscal Note Printed
2021-02-02Senate(S) Fiscal Note Received
2021-01-28Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation
2021-01-28Senate(S) First Reading
2021-01-27 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2021-01-27Senate(S) Fiscal Note Requested
2021-01-27Senate(S) Introduced
2021-01-26 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2021-01-25 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2021-01-22 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2021-01-22 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2021-01-22 (C) Draft in Assembly
2021-01-22 (C) Executive Director Review
2021-01-22 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2021-01-22 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2021-01-21 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2021-01-21 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2021-01-21 (C) Draft in Edit
2021-01-21 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2020-10-28 (C) Draft On Hold
2020-01-17 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback