MT SB124 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws related to student loans
Title
Revise laws related to student loans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Taxation |
2021-04-08 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2021-02-05 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Taxation |
2021-01-29 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-01-28 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-01-28 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-28 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-01-27 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2021-01-21 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2021-01-21 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-01-20 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-01-20 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-01-12 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-01-11 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-11 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-01-11 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-09 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-01-09 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-01-08 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-08 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-01-08 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-01-08 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-01-05 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-01-04 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-12-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-12-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-12-13 | (C) Draft Request Received |