MT SB118 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws relating to false statements to employers and workers' compensation
Title
Revise laws relating to false statements to employers and workers' compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-27 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-03-18 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2021-03-09 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-08 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-08 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-03-01 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-02-27 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2021-02-27 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-02-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-26 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-02-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-23 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Business and Labor |
2021-02-23 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Business and Labor |
2021-02-19 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2021-02-10 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Business and Labor |
2021-02-10 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2021-02-08 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-02-08 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-02-08 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-05 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-05 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-01-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2021-01-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2021-01-26 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2021-01-19 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2021-01-19 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-01-18 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-18 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-01-18 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-01-07 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-07 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-01-07 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-07 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-01-07 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-01-06 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-06 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-01-06 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-01-04 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-01-02 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-12-28 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-12-21 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-09-23 | (C) Draft Request Received |