MT SB114 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the homestead exemption
Title
Revise the homestead exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-05-10 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2021-05-04 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-04 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-03-11 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-03-11 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-03-11 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-03-11 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House |
2021-03-11 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred |
2021-03-10 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2021-02-18 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-02-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-02-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-15 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-02-15 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2021-02-12 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2021-02-08 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2021-02-02 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-02-02 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2021-01-29 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-01-29 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-01-29 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-01-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2021-01-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2021-01-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-01-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Pass Consideration |
2021-01-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-01-25 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-01-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2021-01-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2021-01-20 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2021-01-15 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2021-01-15 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-01-14 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-14 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-01-14 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-01-02 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2020-12-31 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2020-12-31 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2020-12-17 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2020-12-17 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2020-12-17 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2020-12-17 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2020-12-16 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-12-16 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2020-11-27 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-11-24 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-11-24 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2020-11-24 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-11-16 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2020-11-10 | (C) Draft Request Received |