MT SB111 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revising laws re conditional hunting permits for disabled persons
Title
Revising laws re conditional hunting permits for disabled persons
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Molnar [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - (H) Motion Failed (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - (S) Fish and Game Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - (S) Fish and Game Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Human Services |
2021-04-27 | House | (H) Motion Failed |
2021-03-31 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Human Services |
2021-03-25 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2021-02-19 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2021-02-17 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-02-17 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-02-17 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-15 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-02-15 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2021-02-15 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2021-02-15 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-05 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Fish and Game |
2021-02-04 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Fish and Game |
2021-02-01 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-01-26 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Fish and Game |
2021-01-21 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-01-21 | Senate | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-01-20 | Senate | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-01-20 | Senate | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received |
2021-01-20 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-01-15 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Fish and Game |
2021-01-15 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-01-15 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee |
2021-01-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-14 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-01-14 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-01-13 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-01-11 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-11 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-01-11 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-08 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-01-08 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-01-08 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-08 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-01-06 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-01-06 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-01-02 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-12-28 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-12-23 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-12-14 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2020-12-05 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2020-11-29 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-10-29 | (C) Draft Request Received |