MT SB11 | 2017 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-16 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-16 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise insurance tax premium laws relating to workers' compensation
Title
Revise insurance tax premium laws relating to workers' compensation
Sponsors
Rep. Llew Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-16 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2017-11-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-11-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-11-14 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-11-14 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-11-14 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-11-14 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2017-11-14 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-11-14 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-11-14 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-11-14 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-11-14 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-11-14 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-11-14 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-11-14 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-11-14 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2017-11-14 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-11-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-11-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-11-13 | (C) Draft Request Received |