MT SB1 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise lobbying laws to update terminology and conform lobbying definition
Title
Revise lobbying laws to update terminology and conform lobbying definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-02-23 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2021-02-16 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-02-15 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-15 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-02-05 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-02-05 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-02-03 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-02-02 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2021-02-02 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-02-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-01 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-02-01 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-01-28 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) State Administration |
2021-01-28 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) State Administration |
2021-01-26 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2021-01-21 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-01-21 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2021-01-19 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-01-19 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-01-19 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-01-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-01-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-01-14 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) State Administration |
2021-01-13 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) State Administration |
2021-01-11 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2021-01-04 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2020-12-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2020-12-11 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2020-12-11 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2020-12-01 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2020-12-01 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2020-11-30 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2020-11-30 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2020-11-30 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-11-30 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2020-11-30 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2020-11-30 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2020-11-25 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-11-25 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2020-11-11 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-11-09 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-06-25 | (C) Draft Request Received |