MT HR7 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House resolution authorizing intervention in SB 140 legal proceedings
Title
House resolution authorizing intervention in SB 140 legal proceedings
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Vinton [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed (Y: 32 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - House - (H) Resolution Adopted (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - (H) Resolution Adopted (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | (H) Filed with Secretary of State |
2021-04-20 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-15 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-04-15 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-04-13 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-04-13 | House | (H) Resolution Adopted |
2021-04-13 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2021-04-13 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-12 | House | (H) Committee Report--Resolution Adopted (H) Judiciary |
2021-04-09 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (H) Judiciary |
2021-04-09 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2021-04-09 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-04-09 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2021-04-08 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-04-08 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-04-08 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-04-08 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-04-08 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2021-04-08 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-04-08 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-04-08 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-04-07 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-04-07 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-04-07 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-04-07 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-04-07 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-04-07 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-04-07 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-04-07 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-04-07 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-04-07 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-04-07 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-12-18 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2020-12-12 | (C) Draft Request Received |