MT HR6 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution supporting country of origin labeling
Title
Resolution supporting country of origin labeling
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - (H) Resolution Adopted (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - (H) Agriculture Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - (H) Agriculture Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | (H) Filed with Secretary of State |
2023-05-04 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2023-05-02 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2023-05-02 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2023-04-28 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2023-04-27 | House | (H) Resolution Adopted |
2023-04-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-04-14 | House | (H) Committee Report--Resolution Adopted (H) Agriculture |
2023-04-13 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (H) Agriculture |
2023-04-06 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Agriculture |
2023-04-03 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-04-03 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Agriculture |
2023-03-30 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-03-30 | House | (H) Introduced |
2023-03-28 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-03-24 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-03-21 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-03-21 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-03-21 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-03-20 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-03-20 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-03-20 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-03-20 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-03-20 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-03-20 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-03-16 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-03-16 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-03-16 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2023-01-13 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-12 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-01-12 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-12 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-01-12 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-01-12 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-12 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-01-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-01-10 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-01-09 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-01-09 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-01-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |