MT HR5 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Resolution on the public health crisis of pornography
Title
Resolution on the public health crisis of pornography
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - (H) Resolution Adopted (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted as Amended (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted as Amended (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | (H) Filed with Secretary of State |
2019-04-26 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-25 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-24 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-04-23 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-04-23 | House | (H) Resolution Adopted |
2019-04-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-18 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) Committee Report--Resolution Adopted as Amended (H) Human Services |
2019-04-17 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted as Amended (H) Human Services |
2019-04-16 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2019-04-10 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-04-10 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Human Services |
2019-04-10 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2019-04-10 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-04-09 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-04-08 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-04-08 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-04-08 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-04-08 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-04-08 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-04-08 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-04-05 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-04-05 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2019-04-05 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-04-05 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-04-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-21 | (C) Draft Request Received |