MT HJ57 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Process
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Process
Summary
Interim study of homelessness, behavioral health disorders, and public safety
Title
Interim study of homelessness, behavioral health disorders, and public safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Failed (Y: 24 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 25 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 25 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Failed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Judiciary |
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Judiciary |
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2019-04-22 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2019-04-22 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-16 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-16 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-16 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-11 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-04-11 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-11 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-11 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-04-10 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-04-08 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-04-08 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-04-08 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-04-08 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-04-08 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-04-08 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-04-08 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2019-04-08 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-04-08 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-04-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-04-05 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2018-11-06 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-11-06 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Alcohol and Drugs
Health
Law Enforcement
Legislature, Interim Studies
Local Government
Safety
Social Services
Health
Law Enforcement
Legislature, Interim Studies
Local Government
Safety
Social Services