MT HJ2 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue estimating resolution
Title
Revenue estimating resolution
Sponsors
Sen. Becky Beard [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-26 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2021-03-29 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-03-29 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2021-03-26 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2021-03-25 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-03-19 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2021-01-06 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2021-01-05 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Appropriations |
2021-01-05 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2020-12-17 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2020-12-15 | House | (H) Introduced |
2020-12-12 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2020-12-11 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2020-12-10 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2020-12-10 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2020-12-08 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-12-03 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2020-11-25 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-11-23 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-11-20 | (C) Draft Request Received |