MT HJ11 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study terrestrial carbon sequestration
Title
Study terrestrial carbon sequestration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (H) Died in Standing Committee | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Missed Deadline for Interim Study Resolution Transmittal | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Natural Resources | |
2011-03-02 | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources | |
2011-02-14 | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Natural Resources | |
2011-02-07 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources | |
2011-02-07 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Introduced | |
2011-02-04 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-02-01 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-02-01 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-02-01 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-02-01 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-02-01 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-02-01 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2011-01-28 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2011-01-18 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2011-01-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2011-01-12 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws11/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=11&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HJ&Z_ACTION=Find |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2011/houjoint/HJ0011_1.pdf |