MT HJ10 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Study resolution to address American Indian voting
Title
Study resolution to address American Indian voting
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Doane [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | (H) Filed with Secretary of State |
2019-04-30 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-04-26 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-16 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-16 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-04-15 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-04-12 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2019-04-12 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-10 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-05 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) State Administration |
2019-04-04 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) State Administration |
2019-04-01 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2019-03-20 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2019-03-20 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-03-19 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-19 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-03-19 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-18 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-03-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-15 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-03-15 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2019-03-15 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2019-03-12 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2019-01-29 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-29 | House | (H) First Reading (H) State Administration |
2019-01-29 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2019-01-29 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-01-28 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-01-24 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-01-24 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-24 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-24 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-23 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2019-01-23 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-23 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-01-21 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-01-21 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-21 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-19 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-01-19 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2019-01-18 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-17 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-16 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-09 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-12-22 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |