MT HB96 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise free elk license/permit for landowner providing free public elk hunting
Title
Revise free elk license/permit for landowner providing free public elk hunting
Sponsors
Rep. Zach Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed (Y: 48 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-02 - House - (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2017-03-01 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2017-02-07 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed |
2017-02-07 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2017-02-07 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2017-02-07 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-03 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-02-03 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2017-02-02 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2017-01-10 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2017-01-03 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-01-03 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-01-02 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2016-12-28 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2016-12-27 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2016-12-14 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2016-12-14 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-14 | House | (H) Introduced |
2016-12-02 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-12-01 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-11-30 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-11-30 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-11-30 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-11-29 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-11-29 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-11-23 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-11-23 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2016-11-22 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-11-18 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-11-18 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2016-11-06 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-09-15 | (C) Draft Request Received |