MT HB86 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allow the creation of regional fire protection authorities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow the creation of regional fire protection authorities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - House - (H) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29House(H) Died in Process
2021-03-02House(H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
2021-02-04House(H) Tabled in Committee (H) Local Government
2021-02-02House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Local Government
2021-01-28 (C) Amendments Available
2021-01-21House(H) Hearing (H) Local Government
2021-01-05House(H) Hearing Canceled (H) Local Government
2021-01-04House(H) First Reading (H) Local Government
2020-12-24House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Local Government
2020-12-15House(H) Introduced
2020-12-15 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2020-12-11 (C) Draft in Assembly
2020-12-11 (C) Executive Director Review
2020-12-11 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2020-12-11 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2020-12-10 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2020-12-10 (C) Executive Director Review
2020-12-08 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2020-12-08 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2020-12-07 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2020-12-05 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2020-10-26 (C) Draft in Edit
2020-09-29 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2020-09-21 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback