MT HB842 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revise allocation of marijuana tax revenue for psychiatric opportunity zones

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise allocation of marijuana tax revenue for psychiatric opportunity zones

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-06House(H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
2023-03-30House(H) Tabled in Committee (H) Taxation
2023-03-27House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested
2023-03-27House(H) Hearing (H) Taxation
2023-03-23House(H) Fiscal Note Printed
2023-03-23House(H) Fiscal Note Unsigned
2023-03-22House(H) Fiscal Note Received
2023-03-17House(H) First Reading
2023-03-17House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation
2023-03-16House(H) Fiscal Note Requested
2023-03-16 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2023-03-16House(H) Introduced
2023-03-16 (C) Fiscal Note Probable
2023-03-15 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2023-03-14 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2023-03-14 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2023-03-14 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2023-03-14 (C) Draft in Assembly
2023-03-13 (C) Executive Director Review
2023-03-13 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2023-03-13 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2023-03-12 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2023-03-11 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review
2023-03-01 (C) Draft in Edit
2023-02-21 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2023-02-13 (C) Draft Taken Off Hold
2022-12-22 (C) Draft On Hold
2022-11-29 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback