MT HB805 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise laws related to cooperatives

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise laws related to cooperatives

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-14 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-27 Chapter Number Assigned
2023-04-26House(H) Signed by Governor
2023-04-21House(H) Transmitted to Governor
2023-04-20Senate(S) Signed by President
2023-04-20House(H) Signed by Speaker
2023-04-18 (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available
2023-04-18House(H) Returned from Enrolling
2023-04-17House(H) Sent to Enrolling
2023-04-14House(H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
2023-04-14House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2023-04-13House(H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
2023-04-13House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2023-03-29Senate(S) Returned to House with Amendments
2023-03-28Senate(S) 3rd Reading Concurred
2023-03-28Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2023-03-24 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2023-03-24Senate(S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended
2023-03-24Senate(S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
2023-03-24Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2023-03-22Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2023-03-21Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2023-03-21Senate(S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2023-03-14Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2023-03-09Senate(S) First Reading
2023-03-03House(H) Transmitted to Senate
2023-03-03House(H) 3rd Reading Passed
2023-03-02House(H) 2nd Reading Passed
2023-02-28House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Business and Labor
2023-02-28 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2023-02-27House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Business and Labor
2023-02-27 (C) Amendments Available
2023-02-27House(H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor
2023-02-24House(H) First Reading
2023-02-24House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor
2023-02-24 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2023-02-23House(H) Introduced
2023-02-22 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2023-02-21 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2023-02-21 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2023-02-21 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2023-02-21 (C) Draft in Assembly
2023-02-21 (C) Executive Director Review
2023-02-21 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2023-02-21 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2023-02-20 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2023-02-17 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review
2023-02-16 (C) Draft in Edit
2023-02-15 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2023-01-20 (C) Draft Taken Off Hold
2023-01-14 (C) Draft On Hold
2022-12-28 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=805&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20231
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2023/HB0899/HB0805_1.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2023/HB0899/HB0805_2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2023/HB0899/HB0805_3.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2023/HB0899/HB0805_X.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2023/minutes/house/votesheets/HB0805BUH230227.pdf
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1124&P_SESS=20231
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1291&P_SESS=20231
Roll Callhttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2023/minutes/senate/votesheets/HB0805BUS230321.pdf
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1403&P_SESS=20231
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1404&P_SESS=20231
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1470&P_SESS=20231
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H2110&P_SESS=20231
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H2230&P_SESS=20231

Bill Comments

feedback